+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 119 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 119
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/19/16
- Governor approval 05/19/16
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/17/16
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/16
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2341
- Second reading
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2341, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 2, 2016
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Fischer and Masin.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Zerwas.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform