+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Schultz; Bernardy; Johnson, S.; Bly; Hausman.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Lee and Clark.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Moran and Omar.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor