+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Uglem.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Mullery.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Nelson.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Applebaum and Newton.
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance