+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2736
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 9, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Slocum
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy