+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF2130
- Author added Halverson as chief author
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2130
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Author added O'Driscoll
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce