+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Freiberg
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Fischer
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Acomb
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Pryor
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor