+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Schoen.
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg, Atkins, and Kahn.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Fischer, Schultz, and Carlson.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Nelson.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor