+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/17
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 36 05/11/17
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/11/17
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 36
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/11/17
- Governor approval 05/11/17
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 5/9/2017
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/09/17
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass
- Second reading
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF50
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF50, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, February 27, 2017
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture Finance
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Bennett, Poppe, Fabian, and Heintzeman.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture Policy
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy