+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date Sec. 1, 5 05/20/15; Sec. 2-4 01/01/16
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/19/15
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date Various
- Chapter number 43
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/19/2015
- Governor approval 05/19/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 43 05/19/15
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/15/2015
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/15/15
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
- Third reading Passed
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2056
- Second reading
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2056, now on General Orders
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 11, 2015
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 08, 2015
- Second reading
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Baker.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform