+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Motion did not prevail
- Motion to suspend rules
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kahn.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Wagenius.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor