+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bahner
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Elkins
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Pryor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Gomez
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Huot
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Sundin
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor