+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- See SF1458 Article 1
- Author added Fischer.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Mariani.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kahn.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Applebaum.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Halverson.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Theis and Masin.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Pugh, Wills, Runbeck, and Anderson, S.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor