+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, C.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Rosenthal, Fenton, Franson, Whelan, Pugh, Fischer, and Knoblach.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Dill and Drazkowski.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lien.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor