+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Omar.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Clark.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lee.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Bly and Slocum.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Ward.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor