+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Poston.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Layman.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Howe.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lueck.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Thissen.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance