+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Layman
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Lueck
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Backer
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Anderson
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Petersburg
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Theis
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor