+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Fischer.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lesch.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Peterson.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform