+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by Chair to Ways and Means
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Dehn
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means