+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Falk
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Ward, J.A., and Fischer
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Author changed Lillie, chief author
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Lillie
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance