+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF730
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF730
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Maye Quade.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Koegel and Lueck.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Backer.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Olson.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Smith and Franke.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lillie.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor