+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/17
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 22 05/02/17
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/02/17
- Presentment date 05/02/17
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 22
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/02/17
- Governor approval 05/02/2017
- Presented to Governor 5/2/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1243
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1243, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 20, 2017
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Howe.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor