+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Boldon, Pinto, Keeler and Mariani
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Morrison
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Berg
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg and Sandell
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Xiong, T.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lippert
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Acomb
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Vang
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Lee and Olson, L.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Davnie, Hollins and Hornstein
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Gomez
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Xiong, J.; Koegel
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor