+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On January 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 60 05/13/13
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 97-37)
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Motion withdrawn motion to refuse to concur
- Motion prevailed
- Motion for reconsideration of motion to refuse to concur
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- House conferees Slocum, Fritz, Davids
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 50-8)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF316
- Second reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF316, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 90-40)
- Third reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Law
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy