+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On August 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/19
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 08/01/19
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter number 53
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 53 05/22/2019
- Governor's action Approval 05/22/2019
- Presentment date 05/22/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/22/19
- Governor approval 05/22/19
- Presented to Governor 05/22/19
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF149
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF149, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 15, 2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Ways and Means
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means