+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 67 05/16/13
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 5/17/2013
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/17/13
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 67
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/16/13
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/16/13
- Governor approval 05/16/13
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/13/13
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/13/13
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 56-3)
- Special Order
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1131
- Second reading
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1131, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 109-13)
- Third reading
- Amendments offered
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 2, 2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor