+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF218
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF218
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Policy
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Petersburg, Fabian, and Cornish.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Miller.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Davids.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Gruenhagen, Lueck, and Backer.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor