+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF1457
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1457
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Rarick (as chief).
- Author stricken Garofalo.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor