+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by Chair to Ways and Means
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Corrections Division
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means