+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Fischer.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Schultz.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lillie.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor