+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
- Reported to the House
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 11, 2016
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Anderson, M.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 4, 2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Scott.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Anzelc.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Daudt, Metsa, and Dill.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor