+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Schultz
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added West
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Jordan
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hamilton
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor