+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 877
- Author added Johnson, C.
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Newberger.
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 877
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 20, 2016
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Bennett.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Green and Davids.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Policy and Finance
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Backer.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Barrett.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Baker and Franson.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Kiel as chief author.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lueck.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance