+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Vogel.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Pugh and Lueck.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Fenton and Peterson.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kresha.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor