+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 112 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 112
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/22/13
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/22/13
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 51-10)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF744
- Second reading
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF744, now on General Orders
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 124-8)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 16, 2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Mariani and Johnson, S.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Persell and McNamar
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Moran
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Allen, Masin
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added FitzSimmons, Laine, Hansen and Freiberg
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, B.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor