+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Omar.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Davnie.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lee.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Hausman.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor