+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lucero.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor