+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Pinto
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Bahner
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Hornstein and Her
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor