+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Hamilton, Hortman
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Mariani, Hollins, Feist, Lillie and Olson, L.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Her
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Backer and Fischer
- Author stricken Franke
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg, Morrison, Acomb, Lee, Edelson, Davnie, Long, Elkins, Youakim, and Franke
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor