+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Jessup.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Newberger.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Dettmer and Layman.
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes