+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Christensen.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Petersburg, Gunther, Haley, Schomacker, Theis, and Kresha.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Koznick.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Barr, R.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Albright.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Howe.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor