+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/23/19
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 05/23/19
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter number 43
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 43 05/22/2019
- Governor's action Approval 05/22/2019
- Presentment date 05/22/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/22/19
- Governor approval 05/22/19
- Presented to Governor 05/22/19
On May 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1202
- Second reading
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1202, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 15, 2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations