+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- See First Special Session, HF3, Art. 3, Sec. 23, 28-30, 130, 141-142, 144
- Bill laid on table in House
- Joint rule 3.02, conference committee discharged
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Ozmek, Sparks
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to take from table
- Motion prevailed
- New conference committee of 5 requested
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from table in House
- Bill returned to conference committee
- House conferees Torkelson; Runbeck; Petersburg; Howe; Koznick
- Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
- Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Kiffmeyer; Osmek; Sparks
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees Torkelson, Runbeck, Petersburg, Howe, and Koznick.
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- House conferees Torkelson, Runbeck, Petersburg, Howe, and Koznick.
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
- Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Osmek, and Sparks.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- House conferees Torkelson; Runbeck; Petersburg; Howe; Koznick
- Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
- Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Kiffmeyer; Osmek; Sparks
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Joint rule 3.02(a), conference committee discharged, bill laid on table
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1059
- Second reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1059, now on General Orders
- Received from House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor