+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Long
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Hornstein, Bierman and Pryor
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Vang and Lee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Freiberg
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Berg
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor