+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Author stricken Gruenhagen
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Allen
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Myhra
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Gruenhagen, Atkins
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor