+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Metsa
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Masin
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Moran and Isaacson
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Policy
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Hausman and Fischer
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Government Operations
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy (vote: 66-61)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Bernardy and Loeffler
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Laine and Newton
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Freiberg
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Benson, J.; Slocum and Mullery
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor