+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- See Ch. 15
- See Senate file in House SF151
- Author added Frazier
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF151
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor