+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/24/17
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 85 05/23/17
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/17
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 85
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/23/17
- Governor approval 05/23/17
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/17
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/17
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF648
- Second reading
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF648, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 04, 2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor