+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/25/13
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 105 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 105
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 126-0)
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed (vote: 44-0)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Second reading
On April 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Finance
- Introduction and first reading
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 130-0)
- Third reading
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 19, 2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, B.
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Sawatzky
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy