+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Author added McNamara.
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Atkins.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Anzelc.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Persell.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kresha.
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Innovation Policy
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lien.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Mahoney.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Greater Minnesota Economic and Workforce Development Policy
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor