+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture Finance and Policy
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Her
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Ecklund and Klevorn
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Hanson, J.; Sundin; Vang; and Bahner
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor